NY A05726 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To guarantee that copyright claims should not chill the desire or ability of citizens to use public records or serve as an impediment to the economic interests of the State. SUMMARY OF SPECIFIC PROVISIONS Section 1. Section 89 of the public officers law is amended by adding a new subdivision 10 to read as follows: 10. Any copyright in a record prepared by an agency that is disclosed pursuant to the provisions of this article is waived, except if such record reflects artistic creation, scientific or academic research, or if the agency intends to distribute the record or a derivative work based on it to the public by sale or other transfer of ownership, or by rental, lease, or license. If any of the foregoing exceptions apply, the agency may in its discretion waive any such copyright. Section 2. This act shall take effect on the sixtieth day after it shall have become a law.
Title
Waives the ability of government agencies in New York to claim copyright protection except where the record reflects artistic creation, or scientific or academic research, or if the agency intends to distribute the record or derivative work based on it to the public by sale or other transfer of ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-22 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-22 | repassed assembly | |
2010-06-18 | amended on third reading 5726b | |
2010-06-18 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2010-06-18 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-18 | recalled from senate | |
2010-03-17 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2010-03-17 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-17 | passed assembly | |
2010-02-22 | amended on third reading 5726a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.400 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-03-18 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2009-03-18 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-18 | passed assembly | |
2009-03-12 | advanced to third reading cal.244 | |
2009-03-10 | reported | |
2009-02-19 | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S3659-A (Same As) 2010-06-21 - PRINT NUMBER 3659B