NY A05729 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers to provide coverage for tattooing of the nipple-areolar complex pursuant to or as part of breast reconstruction surgery if such tattooing is performed by a physician or other health care practitioner working within their scope of practice.
Title
Requires insurers to provide coverage for tattooing of the nipple-areolar complex pursuant to or as part of breast reconstruction surgery if such tattooing is performed by a physician or other health care practitioner working within their scope of practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.162 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.454 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.454 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 5729a |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06146 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE