NY A05730 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - advanced to third reading cal.407
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - advanced to third reading cal.407
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the installation of smoke detectors in common places of certain dwellings.
Title
Requires the installation of smoke detectors in common places of certain dwellings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.407 |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | print number 5730a |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03249 (Same As) 2024-04-03 - referred to governmental operations