NY A05775 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.83
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.83
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "safe way home act"; provides that sexual assault crime victims and crime victim advocates shall be entitled to free transportation to and from medical facilities such sexual assault crime victims had received initial victim services from.
Title
Relates to enacting the "safe way home act"; provides that sexual assault crime victims and crime victim advocates shall be entitled to free transportation to and from medical facilities such sexual assault crime victims had received initial victim services from.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.83 |
2019-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.737 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.356 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a5775a |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.859 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3966A |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3966a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.356 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.356 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | print number 5775a |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03966 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.83