NY A05775 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s4248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s4248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the court to consider the best interest of a companion animal when awarding possession in a divorce or separation proceeding.
Title
Relates to requiring the court to consider the best interest of a companion animal when awarding possession in a divorce or separation proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4248 |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.322 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04248 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.509