NY A05807 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires quarterly reporting on the opioid settlement fund, including the names of the recipients and the amounts awarded and received.
Title
Requires quarterly reporting on the opioid settlement fund, including the names of the recipients and the amounts awarded and received.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | print number 5807a |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |