NY A05859 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - substituted by s6617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - substituted by s6617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for limited credit time allowances for working in the horse handling program for a period of no less than eighteen months and receipt of a certification from the Groom Elite program.
Title
Provides for limited credit time allowances for working in the horse handling program for a period of no less than eighteen months and receipt of a certification from the Groom Elite program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | substituted by s6617 |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.167 |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.143 |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06617 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - ordered to third reading cal.167