NY A05877 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - signed chap.433
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - signed chap.433
Summary
Establishes the state energy planning board to create and adopt a state energy plan, consider and present policies and programs that are designed to improve the reliability of the state's energy systems, insulate consumers from volatility in market prices, reduce the overall cost of energy in the state and minimize public health and environmental impacts; requires the adoption of a state energy plan every four years and outlines the conduct of the state energy planning proceedings; further requires the first draft of the state energy plan to be presented for public comment on or before September 1, 2012 and the final draft of such plan to be issued on or before March 15, 2013.
Title
Establishes the state energy planning board to create and adopt a state energy plan, consider and present policies and programs that are designed to improve the reliability of the state's energy systems, insulate consumers from volatility in market prices, reduce the overall cost of energy in the state and minimize public health and environmental impacts; requires the adoption of a state energy plan every four years and outlines the conduct of the state energy planning proceedings; further requires the first draft of the state energy plan to be presented for public comment on or before September 1, 2012 and the final draft of such plan to be issued on or before March 15, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-16 | signed chap.433 | |
2009-09-04 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.160 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2501B | |
2009-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-11 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.133 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-28 | print number 5877b | |
2009-05-28 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-03-31 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-03-25 | print number 5877a | |
2009-03-25 | amend and recommit to energy | |
2009-02-20 | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S02501 (Same As) 2009-09-16 - signed chap.433
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05877&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |