NY A05942 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state shall offer a statewide emergency services internet protocol network (ESINet) available for connection to local public safety answering points (PSAPs).
Title
Requires the state shall offer a statewide emergency services internet protocol network (ESINet) available for connection to local public safety answering points (PSAPs).
Sponsors
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Steven Raga [D] | Asm. Matthew Slater [R] |
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | print number 5942a |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2023-03-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04583 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE