NY A05962 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation will provide the constitutional authorization for the Jobs Development Authority (JDA) to extend bonds to finance the construction of infrastructure for eligible businesses, including water and sewer systems, utility and telecommunications links, or to finance energy efficiency, pollution prevention, pollution control or alternative energy systems.
Title
CONCURRENT RESOLUTION OF THE SENATE AND ASSEMBLY proposing an amendment to the constitution, in relation to direct petition and response
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to economic development | |
2009-03-26 | opinion referred to judiciary | |
2009-02-25 | to attorney-general for opinion | |
2009-02-23 | referred to economic development |