NY A05974 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides eligibility for services under the basic health program for individuals whose immigration status renders him or her ineligible for federal financial participation and who meet additional requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides eligibility for services under the basic health program for individuals whose immigration status renders him or her ineligible for federal financial participation and who meet additional requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-22Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03900 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback