NY A06026 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes certain tax abatement forms more readily available to seniors and authorizes certain entities to assist in the completion of such forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes certain tax abatement forms more readily available to seniors and authorizes certain entities to assist in the completion of such forms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.360
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1117
2018-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4555
2018-05-02SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2018-05-02Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-02Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.791
2018-04-24Assemblyreported
2018-02-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to aging
2017-02-21Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S04555 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6026

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06026&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06026&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06026
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06026&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06026&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06026&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6026#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback