NY A06041 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - substituted by s4046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to jewelry containing lead.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to jewelry containing lead.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30Assemblysubstituted by s4046
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.421
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-26Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S04046 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback