NY A06092 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - substituted by s3844b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - substituted by s3844b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Islip to lease certain lands to a business corporation.
Title
Authorizes the town of Islip to lease certain lands to a business corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Assembly | substituted by s3844b |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.507 |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2012-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-17 | Assembly | print number 6092b |
2012-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | print number 6092a |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | held for consideration in local governments |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03844 (Same As) 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.303