NY A06093 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - signed chap.367
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - signed chap.367
Summary
This legislation would mandate that all family dwellings install carbon monoxide detectors.
Title
Establishes Amanda's law requiring certain residences to have installed an operable carbon monoxide detector.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | signed chap.367 | |
2009-08-14 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.886 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2791A | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-18 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-18 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-18 | ordered to third reading rules cal.464 | |
2009-06-18 | rules report cal.464 | |
2009-06-18 | reported | |
2009-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-27 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-05-20 | print number 6093a | |
2009-05-20 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | |
2009-02-25 | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02791 (Same As) 2009-08-26 - signed chap.367
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06093&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |