NY A06123 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposition of cats; allows shelters to put cats, whose owners cannot be identified by any collar, tags or microchip, up for adoption after three days and after an examination by a veterinarian.
Title
Relates to the disposition of cats; allows shelters to put cats, whose owners cannot be identified by any collar, tags or microchip, up for adoption after three days and after an examination by a veterinarian.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | print number 6123a |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S00177 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.421