NY A06124 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to percent of wagers made at off-track betting facilities conducted by in-state thoroughbred racing corporations.
Title
Relates to percent of wagers made at off-track betting facilities conducted by in-state thoroughbred racing corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Senate | tabled |
2016-08-19 | Senate | vetoed memo.211 |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1980 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8019 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.273 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.273 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-03 | Assembly | print number 6124c |
2016-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | print number 6124b |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | print number 6124a |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S08019 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6124C