NY A06144 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers, duties and activities of the authority budget office and clarifies entities subject to the authority of that office.
Title
Relates to the powers, duties and activities of the authority budget office and clarifies entities subject to the authority of that office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | print number 6144a |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04451 (Same As) 2012-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 4451B