NY A06144 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employee notification of contraceptive coverage.
Title
Relates to employee notification of contraceptive coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.435 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.229 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04758 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR