NY A06146 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that veterans who hold either a federal Golden Access Passport or a federal Access Pass upon a determination of a permanent disability shall be granted use of public campsites, parks and other public places of recreation free of charge.
Title
Provides that veterans who hold either a federal Golden Access Passport or a federal Access Pass upon a determination of a permanent disability shall be granted use of public campsites, parks and other public places of recreation free of charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S04095 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - referred to veterans' affairs