NY A06177 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Alice's Law; relates to the crime of insurance fraud with regard to staging accidents.
Title
Enacts Alice's Law; relates to the crime of insurance fraud with regard to staging accidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.380 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.380 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | print number 6177a |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01685 (Same As) 2012-03-22 - referred to codes