NY A06242 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing disability retirement benefits for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrols and deputy sheriff patrol supervisors who suffer any condition or impairment of health caused by methicillin resistant staphylococcus aureus (MRSA) or Staph/MRSA; provides that such disability benefits shall be three-quarters of a member's final average salary.
Title
Relates to establishing disability retirement benefits for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrols and deputy sheriff patrol supervisors who suffer any condition or impairment of health caused by methicillin resistant staphylococcus aureus (MRSA) or Staph/MRSA; provides that such disability benefits shall be three-quarters of a member's final average salary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | print number 6242a |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |