NY A06328 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.748
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.748
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination based on citizenship or immigration status.
Title
Prohibits discrimination based on citizenship or immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | signed chap.748 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1361 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6586A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.83 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.83 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | print number 6328a |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06586 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6328A