NY A06413 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4492
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of transportation to conduct a study pertaining to a proposed expansion of the Long Island Motor Parkway trail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of transportation to conduct a study pertaining to a proposed expansion of the Long Island Motor Parkway trail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s4492
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.366
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.366
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-07Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S04492 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback