NY A06429 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - signed chap.665
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - signed chap.665
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals distribute literature created by the commissioner to patients at a high risk of sickle cell disease.
Title
Requires hospitals distribute literature created by the commissioner to patients at a high risk of sickle cell disease.
Sponsors
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Assembly | signed chap.665 |
2021-11-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1452 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5606B |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6429b |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.372 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | print number 6429a |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05606 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6429B