NY A06476 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s4807a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s4807a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacists to provide immunizations which are recommended by centers for disease control and prevention to patients eighteen years or older.
Title
Authorizes pharmacists to provide immunizations which are recommended by centers for disease control and prevention to patients eighteen years or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s4807a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.210 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 6476a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04807 (Same As) 2021-11-02 - SIGNED CHAP.555