NY A06505 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - print number 6505b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - print number 6505b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts comprehensive provisions to curtail the incidence of asthma and other respiratory diseases; requires teachers in public and non-public school systems to be trained in identifying and responding to asthma emergencies in accordance with standards to be prescribed by the commissioner of education in consultation with the commissioner of health; provides for a program of asthma disease management and control within the department of health; program shall provide various services to health care providers, patients, and others; authorizes the commissioner of health to make grants; provides for a study of asthma incidence and prevalence; provides for an annual report on the program; requires health care providers to provide pregnant women with information on in-utero exposure to tobacco smoke; requires residential leases to include information on the smoking restrictions for the leased premises and in common areas; prohibits idling of motor vehicle engines upon school grounds; authorizes school boards to allow certain students to use inhalers or nebulizers; requires the school that authorizes the use of an inhaler to prepare an asthma treatment plan for the student; ensures safety of all students who suffer from respiratory illnesses in New York; requires reporting of cases of asthma; provides for the curtailing of the use of chemicals which may trigger asthma episodes; provides for the use of the least toxic pesticides which effectively eradicate the targeted organism; includes certain respiratory diseases within the disease management demonstration program; provides for the reduction of emphysema, chronic bronchitis and other chronic respiratory diseases in children; relates to smoking restrictions in certain outdoor areas.
Title
Enacts comprehensive provisions to curtail the incidence of asthma and other respiratory diseases; requires teachers in public and non-public school systems to be trained in identifying and responding to asthma emergencies in accordance with standards to be prescribed by the commissioner of education in consultation with the commissioner of health; provides for a program of asthma disease management and control within the department of health; program shall provide various services to health care providers, patients, and others; authorizes the commissioner of health to make grants; provides for a study of asthma incidence and prevalence; provides for an annual report on the program; requires health care providers to provide pregnant women with information on in-utero exposure to tobacco smoke; requires residential leases to include information on the smoking restrictions for the leased premises and in common areas; prohibits idling of motor vehicle engines upon school grounds; authorizes school boards to allow certain students to use inhalers or nebulizers; requires the school that authorizes the use of an inhaler to prepare an asthma treatment plan for the student; ensures safety of all students who suffer from respiratory illnesses in New York; requires reporting of cases of asthma; provides for the curtailing of the use of chemicals which may trigger asthma episodes; provides for the use of the least toxic pesticides which effectively eradicate the targeted organism; includes certain respiratory diseases within the disease management demonstration program; provides for the reduction of emphysema, chronic bronchitis and other chronic respiratory diseases in children; relates to smoking restrictions in certain outdoor areas.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Victor Pichardo [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Erik Dilan [D] |
Asm. Chad Lupinacci [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Assembly | print number 6505b |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | print number 6505a |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01105 (Same As) 2016-01-08 - PRINT NUMBER 1105A