NY A06529 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - print number 6529a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - print number 6529a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires chain restaurants to place an icon on menus next to food items that have a high content of sodium.
Title
Requires chain restaurants to place an icon on menus next to food items that have a high content of sodium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Assembly | print number 6529a |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04890 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4890A