NY A06542 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - print number 6542a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - print number 6542a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the unified economic development budget act.
Title
Enacts the unified economic development budget act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | Assembly | print number 6542a |
2014-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03446 (Same As) 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3446A