NY A06547 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s4363
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Raises the limitation on amounts to be raised for the repair and improvement of highways in the town of Huntington from $400,000 to $1,000,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raises the limitation on amounts to be raised for the repair and improvement of highways in the town of Huntington from $400,000 to $1,000,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s4363
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.548
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.548
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-11Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S04363 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback