NY A06574 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - committed to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - committed to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to suspension or demotion upon the abolition or reduction of positions for labor class and noncompetitive titles.
Title
Relates to suspension or demotion upon the abolition or reduction of positions for labor class and noncompetitive titles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to governmental employees |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.311 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.225 |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |