NY A06584 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rental assistance for low income elderly families; imposes a tax on conveyances or transfers of residential real property whose consideration is greater than two million dollars.
Title
Relates to rental assistance for low income elderly families; imposes a tax on conveyances or transfers of residential real property whose consideration is greater than two million dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05336 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT