NY A06588 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.365
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.365
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposition of foreign fire insurance premium taxes received by the Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Whitehall, New York.
Title
Relates to the disposition of foreign fire insurance premium taxes received by the Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Whitehall, New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Senate | signed chap.365 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1815 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4160A |
2019-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.496 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.496 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | print number 6588a |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04160 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - signed chap.365