NY A06592 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - print number 6592a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - print number 6592a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts new electric vehicles, clean fuel vehicles and vehicles that meet the clean vehicle standards from the first year of registration fees.
Title
Exempts new electric vehicles, clean fuel vehicles and vehicles that meet the clean vehicle standards from the first year of registration fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Francisco Moya [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] |
Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | print number 6592a |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02292 (Same As) 2016-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 2292A