NY A06602 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to dispensing by physicians of a pharmaceutical with an aesthetic or cosmetic use or purpose.
Title
Relates to dispensing by physicians of a pharmaceutical with an aesthetic or cosmetic use or purpose.
Sponsors
Asm. Sam Hoyt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | print number 6602a |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2011-03-23 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04075 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION