NY A06628 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - substituted by s2438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - substituted by s2438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions to combat the incidence of adult and childhood obesity; provides for direct marketing of fresh vegetables and fruits in areas with a high incidence of adult and child obesity; directs Cornell cooperative extension program to offer obesity and respiratory disease prevention programs.
Title
Establishes provisions to combat the incidence of adult and childhood obesity; provides for direct marketing of fresh vegetables and fruits in areas with a high incidence of adult and child obesity; directs Cornell cooperative extension program to offer obesity and respiratory disease prevention programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s2438 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.598 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S02438 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.530