NY A06658 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - print number 6658a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - print number 6658a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would require the State to pay for Medi- care Part A premiums for those persons dually eligible for Medicare Part A and Medicaid and requires local commissioners of social services to appeal denials of Medicare coverage before approving Medicaid coverage for long term care.
Title
Requires the state to pay medicare part A premiums for persons eligible for medicare part A and medical assistance and requires local commissioners of social services to appeal denial of medicare coverage before approving medical assistance coverage for long term care.
Sponsors
Asm. Francine DelMonte [D] | Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Asm. Naomi Rivera [D] | Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Darryl Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | print number 6658a | |
2010-03-17 | amend and recommit to health | |
2010-01-06 | referred to health | |
2009-03-11 | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S6874 (Same As) 2010-02-18 - REFERRED TO HEALTH