NY A06670 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to entrepreneurship assistance centers to provide assistance to primarily minority group members, women, individuals with a disability and dislocated workers; requires the department of economic development to establish criteria and designation of such centers; sets forth requirements for each center.
Title
Relates to entrepreneurship assistance centers to provide assistance to primarily minority group members, women, individuals with a disability and dislocated workers; requires the department of economic development to establish criteria and designation of such centers; sets forth requirements for each center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6670a |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.217 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.475 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | referred to small business |