NY A06670 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes David Goodman to apply for retroactive membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system.
Title
Authorizes David Goodman to apply for retroactive membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s5691 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.587 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05691 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.538