NY A06706 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transfers of cable systems.
Title
Relates to transfers of cable systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.223 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.218 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.218 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07085 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS