NY A06706 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6788
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6788
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Justin Whitmore.
Title
Grants retroactive membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Justin Whitmore.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Robert Smullen [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6788 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.826 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06788 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.665