NY A06709 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the extension of the state commission on the restoration of the capitol; extends such commission five years.
Title
Relates to the extension of the state commission on the restoration of the capitol; extends such commission five years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.207 |
2013-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1275 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4258 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.227 |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S04258 (Same As) 2013-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6709