NY A06710 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.255
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.255
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes police agencies to include cases of missing vulnerable adults in their semi-annual reports to the division of criminal justice services.
Title
Authorizes police agencies to include cases of missing vulnerable adults in their semi-annual reports to the division of criminal justice services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.255 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1060 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1100A |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.810 |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | print number 6710a |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01100 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6710A