NY A06716 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-26 - print number 6716a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-26 - print number 6716a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an inmate of a correctional facility shall be guilty of a felony for harassing a correctional facility employee by fraudulent use of his or her name in publishing the name or ordering products under the employee's name.
Title
Provides that an inmate of a correctional facility shall be guilty of a felony for harassing a correctional facility employee by fraudulent use of his or her name in publishing the name or ordering products under the employee's name.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | Assembly | print number 6716a |
2012-01-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2011-03-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00233 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 233A