NY A06722 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of benthic barriers, between July 1 and October 31, to control invasive aquatic plants around docks.
Title
Authorizes the use of benthic barriers, between July 1 and October 31, to control invasive aquatic plants around docks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | print number 6722a |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05189 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES