NY A06727 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance.
Title
Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.441 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.441 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to insurance |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.319 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.139 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.139 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05606 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE