NY A06751 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises.
Title
Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Assembly | signed chap.406 |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1113 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6316 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.173 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.173 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06316 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6751