NY A06753 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipalities to expand casino gambling in the state upon a vote.
Title
Allows municipalities to expand casino gambling in the state upon a vote.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in racing and wagering |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2011-05-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2011-03-28 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |