NY A06770 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the residency requirement for the Herkimer county commissioner of social services, provided that such person remains a resident of an adjoining county.
Title
Waives the residency requirement for the Herkimer county commissioner of social services, provided that such person remains a resident of an adjoining county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Assembly | signed chap.407 |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.770 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6405 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.269 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.269 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06405 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6770