NY A06821 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring businesses to provide to the division of consumer protection a telephone number at which such business may be contacted for the submission of consumer complaints, and authorizing such division to create a registry of such telephone numbers.
Title
Relates to requiring businesses to provide to the division of consumer protection a telephone number at which such business may be contacted for the submission of consumer complaints, and authorizing such division to create a registry of such telephone numbers.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.781 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |